http://www.satp.org/satporgtp/countries/shrilanka/database/leaders_assassinated_byLTTE.htm
Prominent Political Leaders Assassinated by The LTTE
Name | Post Held | Date Assassinated |
Jeyaraj Fernandopulle
|
Highway Minister
|
April 7, 2008
|
D.M. Dissanayake
|
Non-Cabinet Minister for Nation Building
|
January 8, 2008
|
T. Maheshwaran
|
Member of Parliament
|
January 1, 2008
|
Herath Abeyweera
|
Chief Secretary to the Eastern Province
|
July 16, 2007
|
Kethesh Logananathan
|
Deputy Secretary-General of the Government's SCOPP
|
August 12, 2006
|
Nataraja raviraj
|
Tamil National Alliance (TNA) MP, Jaffna
|
August 8, 2006
|
Joseph Pararajasingham
|
Tamil National Alliance (TNA) MP, Batticaloa
|
December 25, 2005
|
Lakshman Kadirgamar
|
Foreign Affairs Minister
|
August 12, 2005
|
M.L. Baithullah
|
Peoples Alliance Candidate
|
2 October 2000
|
Cheliyan Perimpanayakam
|
Peoples Alliance Candidate & Former Mayor, Batticoloa
|
10 September 2000
|
C. V. Goonaratne
|
Federal Minister, Industrial Development
|
7 June 2000
|
Aruna De Silva
|
Deputy Mayor, Dehiwala
|
7 June 2000
|
Marias Anton aka David
|
People’s Liberation Organisation of Tamil Eelam (PLOTE) leader, Mannar
|
10 December 1999
|
Atputharajah Nadarajah, Alias Ramesh
|
Eelam People's Democratic Party (EPDP) leader
|
2 November, 1999
|
Nagalingam Manikkadasan
|
Military wing leader, PLOTE
|
2 September 1999
|
Neelan Thiruchelvam
|
MP and TULF leader
|
29 July 1999
|
Muthulingam Ganesh Kumar a.k.a Razeek
|
Leader, Razeek group, Batticaloa
|
29 May 1999
|
Ponnuyhurai Sivapalan
|
Jaffna Mayor; succeeded Yogeswaran
|
11 September 1998
|
S. Shanmuganadan
|
MP
|
15 July 1998
|
Ms. Sarojini Yogeswaran
|
Jaffna Mayor
|
17 May 1998
|
Mohammad Maharoof
|
Member of Parliament (MP), Trincomalee
|
20 July 1997
|
Arunachalam Thangathurai
|
MP, Trincomalee
|
5 July 1997
|
Thomas Anton
|
Deputy Mayor, Batticaloa
|
26 October 1995
|
Karavai Kandamasamy
|
Deputy Chairman, Democratic People's Liberation Front
|
31 December 1994
|
Gamini Disanayake
|
Presidential candidate, UNP
|
24 October 1994
|
G. M. Premachandra
|
MP
|
24 October 1994
|
Weerasinghe Mallimarachchi
|
MP
|
24 October 1994
|
Dr. Ganini Wijesekarea
|
MP
|
24 October 1994
|
Ossie Abeygunasekara
|
MP
|
24 October 1994
|
Ranasinghe Premadasa
|
President, Sri Lanka
|
1 May 1993
|
Rajiv Gandhi
|
Former Prime Minister, India
|
22 May 1991
|
Ranjan Wijeratne
|
Minister of State, Defence, Sri Lanka
|
2 March 1991
|
K. Kanagaratnam
|
MP, Eastern Province
|
15 July 1990
|
T. Ganeshalingam
|
Minister, North East Provincial Council
|
28 June 1990
|
K. Padmanabha
|
General Secretary, Eelam Peoples Revolutionary Liberation Front (EPRLF)
|
19 June 1990
|
V. Yogasankari
|
MP, Jaffna
|
19 June 1990
|
P. Kirubakaran
|
Finance Minister, North East Provincial Council
|
19 June 1990
|
Sam Tambimuttu
|
MP, Batticaloa
|
7 May 1990
|
Uma Maheswaran
|
PLOTE Leader
|
July 16, 1989
|
A. Amrithalingam
|
General Secretary, TULF
|
13 July 1989
|
V. Yogeswaran
|
Former MP, Jaffna
|
13 July 1989
|
A. Majeed
|
Former MP, Mutur,
|
13 November 1987
|
Sri Sabarathnam
|
TELO leader
|
6 May 1986
|
K. Alalasunderam
|
MP, Kopay
|
3 September 1985
|
V. Dharmalingam
|
MP, Manipay
|
3 September 1985
|
A. Thiagarajah
|
MP, Vaddukoddai
|
25 May 1981
|
Alfred Duraiyapah
|
Former Mayor, Jaffna
|
27 July 1975
|
No comments:
Post a Comment